Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2017
|
Public Act 17-66
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
House Calendar Number 480
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6135
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
File Number 309
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 172
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|