Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2017
|
Public Act 17-70
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
House Calendar Number 643
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6268
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
File Number 615
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 334
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|