Senate
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Public Act 17-39
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House Calendar Number 542
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7276
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
File Number 374
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 203
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|