Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2017
|
Public Act 17-67
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House Calendar Number 603
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7910
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
File Number 565
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 300
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|