Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | File Number 566 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 301 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |