Senate | 05/10/2017 | File Number 745 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 426 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/09/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |