Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Public Act 17-219
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Calendar Number 658
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8723
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
File Number 476
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 240
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|