Senate | 05/25/2017 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6720 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | File Number 380 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 201 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |