Senate | 06/03/2017 | House Calendar Number 645 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8384 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7087 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | File Number 381 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 193 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |