Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Public Act 17-7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
House Calendar Number 483
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6616
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
File Number 617
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 320
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|