Senate | 05/31/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Public Act 17-16 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | House Calendar Number 484 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | File Number 650 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 339 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |