Senate | 06/27/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/14/2017 | Public Act 17-86 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | House Calendar Number 547 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | File Number 535 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 285 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |