Senate | 06/07/2017 | Bill Passed Temporary | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | House Calendar Number 624 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7938 | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 7938 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | File Number 536 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 286 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |