Senate | 04/13/2017 | File Number 619 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 376 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | House Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Motion Failed SF | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |