Senate | 05/05/2017 | House Calendar Number 485 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | File Number 621 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 321 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |