Senate | 04/21/2017 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | File Number 485 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 270 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |