Senate | 05/26/2017 | House Calendar Number 605 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7534 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | File Number 418 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 213 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |