Senate | 04/05/2017 | File Number 445 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 232 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |