Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
Public Act 17-204
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House Calendar Number 606
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7649
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7934
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
File Number 622
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 315
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|