Senate | 06/03/2017 | House Calendar Number 647 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7256 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | File Number 711 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 390 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |