Senate | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |