Senate | 04/12/2017 | File Number 570 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 304 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |