Senate | 07/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/29/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/29/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/21/2017 | Public Act 17-205 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | House Calendar Number 571 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 7667 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | File Number 697 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 385 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |