Senate | 05/25/2017 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | File Number 541 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 288 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |