Senate | 05/26/2017 | House Calendar Number 608 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7929 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | File Number 712 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 391 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |