Senate | 06/05/2017 | House Calendar Number 653 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/05/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | File Number 679 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 361 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |