Senate | 04/24/2017 | File Number 699 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 384 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Public Hearing 03/27 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |