Senate | 05/19/2017 | House Calendar Number 550 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | File Number 680 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 362 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Public Hearing 03/27 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |