Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01053 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1053
22 January Session, 2017 LCO No. 6174
33 *06174_______FIN*
44 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
55 Introduced by:
66 (FIN)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 1053
1111
1212 January Session, 2017
1313
1414 LCO No. 6174
1515
1616 *06174_______FIN*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (FIN)
2323
2424 AN ACT PHASING OUT THE HOSPITALS TAX.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 12-263b of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2017):
2929
3030 (a) (1) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after July 1, 2011, and prior to July 1, 2017, there is hereby imposed a tax on the net patient revenue of each hospital in this state to be paid each calendar quarter. The rate of such tax shall be up to the maximum rate allowed under federal law and in conformance with the state budget adopted by the General Assembly. Each hospital shall be promptly notified of the amount of tax due by the Commissioner of Social Services. The Commissioner of Social Services shall determine the base year on which such tax shall be assessed in order to ensure conformance with the state budget adopted by the General Assembly. The Commissioner of Social Services may, in consultation with the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management and in accordance with federal law, exempt a hospital from the tax on payment earned for the provision of outpatient services based on financial hardship. Effective July 1, 2012, and for the succeeding fifteen months, the rates of such tax, the base year on which such tax shall be assessed [,] and the hospitals exempt from the outpatient portion of the tax based on financial hardship shall be the same tax rates, base year and outpatient exemption for hardship in effect on January 1, 2012.
3131
3232 (2) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after July 1, 2017, and prior to July 1, 2021, the amount of the tax imposed under subdivision (1) of this subsection shall be assessed in accordance with the provisions of this subdivision. The Commissioner of Social Services may, in consultation with the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management and in accordance with federal law, exempt a hospital from the tax on payment earned for the provision of outpatient services based on financial hardship.
3333
3434 (A) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after July 1, 2017, and prior to July 1, 2018, the amount of the tax shall be equal to eighty per cent of the total amount of tax imposed on the hospital under subdivision (1) of this subsection during the calendar quarters commencing July 1, 2015, and prior to July 1, 2016.
3535
3636 (B) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after July 1, 2018, and prior to July 1, 2019, the amount of the tax shall be equal to sixty per cent of the total amount of tax imposed on the hospital under subdivision (1) of this subsection during the calendar quarters commencing July 1, 2015, and prior to July 1, 2016.
3737
3838 (C) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after July 1, 2019, and prior to July 1, 2020, the amount of the tax shall be equal to forty per cent of the total amount of tax imposed on the hospital under subdivision (1) of this subsection during the calendar quarters commencing July 1, 2015, and prior to July 1, 2016.
3939
4040 (D) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after July 1, 2020, and prior to July 1, 2021, the total amount of the tax shall be equal to twenty per cent of the amount of tax imposed on the hospital under subdivision (1) of this subsection during the calendar quarters commencing July 1, 2015, and prior to July 1, 2016.
4141
4242 (E) For calendar quarters commencing on or after July 1, 2021, no tax shall be imposed under this section.
4343
4444 (b) [Each] Until August 1, 2021, each hospital shall, on or before the last day of January, April, July and October of each year render to the Commissioner of Revenue Services a return, on forms prescribed or furnished by the Commissioner of Revenue Services and signed by one of its principal officers, stating specifically the name and location of such hospital, and the amount of its net patient revenue as determined by the Commissioner of Social Services. Payment shall be made with such return. Each hospital shall file such return electronically with the department and make such payment by electronic funds transfer in the manner provided by chapter 228g, irrespective of whether the hospital would otherwise have been required to file such return electronically or to make such payment by electronic funds transfer under the provisions of chapter 228g.
4545
4646 (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of law: [, for]
4747
4848 (1) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after July 1, 2015, and prior to January 1, 2016, the amount of tax credit or credits otherwise allowable against the taxes imposed under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i shall not exceed fifty and one one-hundredths per cent of the amount of tax due under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i with respect to such calendar quarter prior to the application of such credit or credits.
4949
5050 (2) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after January 1, 2016, and prior to January 1, 2017, the amount of tax credit or credits otherwise allowable against the taxes imposed under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i shall not exceed fifty-five per cent of the amount of tax due under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i with respect to such calendar quarter prior to the application of such credit or credits.
5151
5252 (3) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after January 1, 2017, and prior to January 1, 2018, the amount of tax credit or credits otherwise allowable against the taxes imposed under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i shall not exceed sixty per cent of the amount of tax due under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i with respect to such calendar quarter prior to the application of such credit or credits.
5353
5454 (4) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after January 1, 2018, and prior to January 1, 2019, the amount of tax credit or credits otherwise allowable against the taxes imposed under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i shall not exceed sixty-five per cent of the amount of tax due under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i with respect to such calendar quarter prior to the application of such credit or credits.
5555
5656 (5) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after January 1, 2019, and prior to July 1, 2021, the amount of tax credit or credits otherwise allowable against the taxes imposed under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i shall not exceed seventy per cent of the amount of tax due under sections 12-263a to 12-263e, inclusive, and 12-263i with respect to such calendar quarter prior to the application of such credit or credits.
5757
5858
5959
6060
6161 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6262 Section 1 July 1, 2017 12-263b
6363
6464 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6565
6666 Section 1
6767
6868 July 1, 2017
6969
7070 12-263b
7171
7272 Statement of Purpose:
7373
7474 To phase out the hospitals tax.
7575
7676 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]