Senate | 07/07/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/19/2017 | Public Act 17-164 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | File Number 740 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 424 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Public Hearing 04/25 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |