House | 11/09/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 11/03/2017 | Public Act 17-3 | ||
House | 10/31/2017 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
House | 10/26/2017 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 10/26/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 10/26/2017 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 10/26/2017 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 10101 | ||
House | 10/26/2017 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10103 | ||
House | 10/26/2017 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 09/15/2017 | Immediate Transmittal to the House | ||
Senate | 09/15/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 09/15/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10080 | ||
Senate | 09/15/2017 | Emergency Certification |