House | 12/06/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 11/29/2017 | Public Act 17-4 | ||
House | 11/21/2017 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
House | 11/15/2017 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 11/15/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 11/15/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 11/14/2017 | Immediate Transmittal to the House | ||
Senate | 11/14/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 11/13/2017 | Emergency Certification |