Senate | 03/29/2017 | File Number 311 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 165 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |