Senate | 05/19/2017 | House Calendar Number 513 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | File Number 165 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 99 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |