Senate | 05/19/2017 | House Calendar Number 514 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | File Number 276 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 154 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |