House | 05/30/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | House Calendar Number 572 | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 496 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Public Hearing 05/22 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |