Senate | 02/01/2017 | Unfavorable Report, Accepted by Senate | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | File Number 2 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 27 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Unfavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office - Unfavorable | ||
Senate | 01/23/2017 | Motion Failed SF | ||
Senate | 01/13/2017 | Public Hearing 01/23 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/06/2017 | Filed with Senate Clerks |