House | 06/07/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/24/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/24/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/22/2018 | Public Act 18-103 | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 269 | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/20/2018 | File Number 14 | ||
House | 03/20/2018 | House Calendar Number 42 | ||
House | 03/20/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/20/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/09/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/08/2018 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/07/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |