House | 04/10/2018 | House Reconsidered and Retained | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | House Reconsidered Bill | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | File Number 51 | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | House Calendar Number 65 | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/28/2018 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 02/08/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |