House | 04/04/2018 | File Number 167 | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | House Calendar Number 126 | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 02/08/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |