House | 04/26/2018 | File Number 646 | ||
House | 04/26/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 420 | ||
House | 04/26/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4089 | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 3758 | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | File Number 347 | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | House Calendar Number 221 | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2018 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
House | 02/08/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |