House | 04/10/2018 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | House Calendar Number 33 | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | File Number 1 | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/28/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/16/2018 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/15/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |