House
|
05/24/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2018
|
Public Act 18-11
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 425
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2018
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
File Number 413
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
House Calendar Number 262
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|