House
|
06/04/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2018
|
Public Act 18-92
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2018
|
File Number 621
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 372
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 3749
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3428
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2018
|
File Number 8
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2018
|
House Calendar Number 36
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2018
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|