House | 04/03/2018 | File Number 143 | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | House Calendar Number 114 | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |