House | 05/25/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/14/2018 | Public Act 18-13 | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 311 | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | File Number 145 | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | House Calendar Number 116 | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/16/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |