Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Public Act 18-158
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 562
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5921
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
File Number 233
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
House Calendar Number 166
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2018
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|