Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Public Act 18-159
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 516
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2018
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4900
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
File Number 60
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
House Calendar Number 74
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|