House | 05/25/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/14/2018 | Public Act 18-14 | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/26/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 426 | ||
House | 04/26/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | File Number 491 | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | House Calendar Number 334 | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/05/2018 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |