House | 03/28/2018 | File Number 63 | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | House Calendar Number 77 | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |